Parker Sheet Metal, Inc. v. Contractor's Bonding and Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Parker Sheet Metal, Inc.
Defendant: Hurst & Burr Mechanical, Inc., Contractor's Bonding and Insurance Company, JE Hurley Construction, Inc., James Martin and David Draper
Counter_claimant: JE Hurley Construction, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Parker Sheet Metal, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00745
Filed: March 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party bears its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 06/28/13. (jjhsl, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER of Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defenses With Prejudice. ORDERED that the parties' Stipulated Motion for Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defenses 48 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the parties joint Motion for Order Confirming Settlement Agreement as a Court Order 49 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report indicating which issues are remaining for this court to resolve on or before May 25, 2012 by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 05/15/12.(jjhsl, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERfor Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendants Hurst & Burr Mechanical, Inc. and David Draper. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants David Draper and Hurst & Burr Mechanical, Inc. 36 GRANTED. As of the d ate of this order Defendants Hurst & Burr Mechanical, Inc. and David Draper shall be jointly and severally liable to Parker Sheet Metal. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Claim for Relief for breach of contract against Defendant Hurst & Burr Mechanical, Inc., only, is hereby DISMISSED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/08/12. (jjhsl, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/13/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2012. ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference set for July 2, 2012, is VACATED and RESET toJuly 31, 2012, at 10:30 a.min Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/27/12.(jjhsl, )
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/01/12.(jjh, )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing proceedings held on 11/28/2011 before Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Granting 36 Motion for Default Judgment. Counsel shall submit a proposed form of default judgment. (Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom) (wydcd, rrk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker Sheet Metal, Inc. v. Contractor's Bonding and Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurst & Burr Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractor's Bonding and Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott Joseph Mikulecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JE Hurley Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Joseph Mikulecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JE Hurley Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Joseph Mikulecky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Parker Sheet Metal, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert R. Egle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parker Sheet Metal, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert R. Egle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?