Lopez-Ballesteros v. United States Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Matta Lopez-Ballesteros
Defendant: United States Federal Bureau of Prisons, Harley Lappin, Michael Nalley and Blake R. Davis
Case Number: 1:2011cv00783
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. That this action is DISMISSED. The Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 42 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set 7/20/2012 is VACATED. The trial to the court set to commence 7/23/2012 is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/9/12. (lsw, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 COURTROOM MINUTE/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 10/27/2011. Withdrawing 14 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss; Granting 23 Motion to Amend Complaint; Granting 31 "Motion" Corrected Amended Complaint. The Corrected Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief 34 is the operative pleading as of 10/27/2011. (Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller) (mjwcd)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion To Dismiss Corrected Amended Complaint 35 is STRICKEN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/26/2011.(sah, )
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn.Four (4) day Bench Trial set for 7/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/24/11. (rebsec, )
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. The Unopposed Motion to Consolidate and for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading, 8 , filed with the court on 6/13/2011, is GRANTED up to and including 8/17/2011. The Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference, 6 , filed with the Court on 6/13/2011, is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set on 6/27/2011, at 9:30 a.m., is VACATED and RESET on 8/24/2011, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom A-502. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/14/2011.(sah, )
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/4/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Ballesteros v. United States Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ramon Matta Lopez-Ballesteros
Represented By: Lawrence E. Besser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?