Self v. Milyard et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Self
Defendant: Kevin Milyard, Aristedes W. Zavaras, Cheryl Smith, Gary Fortunato, Kathy Lovell, Gatbel Chamjock, Beverly Dowis, Physician Health Partners, Inc., LifeCare, Inc., Daniel (I) Schellenger, Nicole (I) Hensman, Nicole Hensman and Daniel Schellenger
Case Number: 1:2011cv00813
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court enters judgment in favor of the defendant Gatbel Chamjock and dismisses all claims and this civil action against him, with prejudice. The Court orders that defend ants Beverly Dowis and Kevin Milyard are entitled to the protection of qualified immunity with respect to all claims against them for money damages. However, the Court denies the motion insofar as it sought dismissal of the second and third claims against Ms. Dowis and Mr. Milyard to the extent those claims seek equitable relief. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/19/12.(mnfsl, )
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM TO TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF DANIEL SELF. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/25/2012. (sahsl, )
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/1/2012. For reasons as stated on the record, the court DENIES without prejudice the plaintiff's 53 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. Mr. Lampiasi shall be required to file a motion to strike/dismiss Mr. Zavaras no later than June 4, 2012 by 5:00 p.m. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss 23 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is granted with respect to plaintiffs Claim One as to all moving defendants. It is granted as to Claim Three as to defendants Dowis and Chamjock. The Court also holds that, as to Claim Three, defendants Milyard, Smith and Krebs are entitled to qualified immunity against plaintiffs claim for money damages. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/7/2012.(sahsl, )
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A five-day Jury Trial set for 7/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. Trial Preparation Conference set for 6/29/2012 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/7/2011. (rbjsec. )
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 THIRD ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 12/6/2011 at 10:45 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/10/11. (cbssec)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RESETTING Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2011 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/22/2011. Confidential Settlement Statements due 7/22/2011. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/14/2011. (cbscd)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting for 6/16/2011 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/1/11. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self v. Milyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Self
Represented By: Brett Daniel Lampiasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Milyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes W. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Fortunato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatbel Chamjock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physician Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifeCare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel (I) Schellenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole (I) Hensman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Hensman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Schellenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?