Savajian v. Milyard et al
Petitioner: Gregg Joseph Savajian
Respondent: John Suthers and Kevin Milyard
Case Number: 1:2011cv00913
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RETURNING 26 State Court Records, by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/13/2014. (evana, )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of John Suthers, Kevin Milyard against Gregg Joseph Savajian re: 39 Order, it is ORDERED that Applicant Gregg Joseph Savajians Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Application) ECF No. 1 is DENIED and the civil action is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear his own costs and attorneys fees, by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 10/11/2012. (ervsl, )
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re: 1 Gregg Joseph Savajians Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, is DENIED and the civil action is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear his own costs and attorneys fees. It is FURTHER ORDERED that n o certificate of appealability will issue because Applicant Gregg Joseph Savajian has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court certifies pursu ant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). If Applicant files a notice of appeal he also must pay the full $455 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit within thirty days in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24., by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/10/2012. (ervsl, )
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 32 Applicants request for state court records by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/17/2012.(ervsl, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that all ineffective assistance of counsel claims asserted in Claim Three, except the sleeping jurors claim, are dismissed as procedurally barred. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty days Respondents are directed to file an answer in com pliance with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases that fully addresses the merits of Claims One, Two, and the remaining part of Claim Three. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty days of the filing of the answer Mr. Savajian may file a reply if he desires. It is FURTHER ORDERED that no order for the state court record will issue as the record already has been secured by the Court, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/30/2012. (ervsl, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/2012. (sah, )
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Minute ORDER granting 22 "Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Leave of Court to Expand and/or Clarify Record Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, Rule 7." Affidavit attached to Motion is noted as received for consideration, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/19/11.(lyg, )
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Second ORDER for State Court Record, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/18/11. (lyg, )
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for State Court Record, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/16/11. (lyg, )
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 15 Motion to Clarify. Applicant will be allowed 30 days from the date of this minute order to comply with the 6/23/11 Order 14 , by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/12/11.(lsw, )
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. ORDERED that Mr. Savajian's 28 U.S.C. § 636 Objection 12 , is overruled. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Savajian's request to amend the Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 13 is denied as unneces sary. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Savajian's request to suspend temporarily any ruling pending by Magistrate Judge Boland 13 is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Appointment of Counsel 9 is denied as premature. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Savajian shall file either a Reply to the Pre-Answer Response or an Amended Application within 21 days from the date of this Order, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/23/11.(lygsl, )
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. ORDERED that Mr. Savajian's Letter 10 , is construed in part as a Motion for Recusal, filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 455(a), and is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the instant action is properly before me under D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1.B.5, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/19/11. (lyg, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/13/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savajian v. Milyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: Deborah Isenberg Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Milyard
Represented By: Deborah Isenberg Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregg Joseph Savajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?