Thompson v. Southwest Health Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carla Thompson
Defendant: Southwest Health Systems, Inc. and William G. Rainer
Case Number: 1:2011cv00947
Filed: April 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Dolores
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying 102 Motion for New Trial, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/7/2013.(rpmcd)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT re 97 : is entered in favor of defendants Southwest Health Systems Inc., d/b/a Southwest Memorial Hospital and William G. Rainer, Jr., M.D., and against plaintiff Carla Thompson. Defendants shall have their costs by the filing of Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen days of entry of judgment. The Complaint, Amended Complaint and this civil action are dismissed, by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/13. (rpmcd)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits and Depositions, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/9/13. (Exhibits and Depositons returned to counsel). (rpmcd)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Courtroom Minutes for Pretrial Conference held on 11/2/2012 held before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Counsel to submit proposed voir dire and jury instruction by 4:00 p.m. December 26, 2012. Motion to Amend Complaint 73 , is denied. Pretrial Order signed. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Denying 67 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/25/2012.(rpmcd)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: 67 to and including September 25, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/30/2012. (rpmcd)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 1/2/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2012 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, lead counsel present in person and no parties or representatives of parties permitted. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m. 10/25/2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/19/2012. (rpmcd )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 49 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2012. (rpmcd )
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2012 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Motion to Compel Disclosure of Risk Management Records 30 , is granted as stated on record. (FTR: K. Terasaki) (rpmcd)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint. The amended complaint tendered as Doc. 18 is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/18/2011.(rpmcd)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4. Defendant Southwest Health Systems, Inc., shall file its corporate disclosure statement by July 18, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/7/2011. (rpmcd)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/12/2011 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on August 4, 2011, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/6/2011. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Southwest Health Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G. Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Thompson
Represented By: Deborah L. Taussig
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?