Villarreal v. USA

Petitioner: Salomon Juan Marcos Villarreal
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2011cv01000
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming 53 Report and Recommendations: 35 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal is denied, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/19/12.(dkals, )
May 22, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: HOLDS IN ABEYANCE 35 Motion to Stay; (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
March 23, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming November 28, 2011 29 Recommendation of United States Magistrate. The [30' objections Petitioner raised are overruled. The 13 Government's Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to Petition to Quash a Summons Served on American National Bank and Motion for Enforcement of IRS Summons is granted, and the summons is hereby ordered enforced. This case is dismissed. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/23/12.(mnfsl, )
August 18, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to file a Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to te United States Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Enforcement of IRS Summons by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/18/2011.(erv, )
April 22, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Status Conference set for 6/23/2011 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/22/11. (lsw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villarreal v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salomon Juan Marcos Villarreal
Represented By: John V. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?