Shire LLC et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Plaintiff: Shire LLC, Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amy F.T. Arnsten, Pasko Rakic and Robert D. Hunt
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01110
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Judgment and Order of Permanent Injunction (Order granting 154 Motion for Judgment). Civil Case Terminated. All pending deadlines/hearings are vacated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/18/13. (alvsl)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER - Claim Construction, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/12. (alvsl)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting 134 Emergency Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Close of fact discovery, 1/30/13. Close of expert discovery, 5/29/13. Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/13. Opening expert reports due by 4/5/13. Rebuttal expert reports due by 4/26/13. Reply expert reports due by 5/8/13. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/13 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/22/12. (alvsl)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER re: 84 Status Report Regarding Claim Construction. The Court adopts the schedule proposed by the defendant, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/6/11. (gmssl, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. Defendant Sandoz Inc.'s 70 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims is granted. The Clerk of Court shall file Sandoz Inc.'s 70 -1 First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Shire's First Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/12/11.(mnfsl, )
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/14/2011. (kmtcd)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/22/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/22/11. (mnfsl, )
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/15/11.(mnf, )
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING HEARING UNDER FED. R. CIV. P 16. Rule 16 Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/13/11. (mnf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shire LLC et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shire LLC
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supernus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy F.T. Arnsten
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasko Rakic
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Hunt
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Richard Thomas Ruzich
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: Theresa R. Wardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?