Adamson v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Alfred Jay Adamson
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv01267
Filed: May 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion For Attorney Fees Under EAJA. The defendant SHALL pay to plaintiff in care of the plaintiff's attorney attorney fees under the EAJA in the amount of $7500.00. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/3/13. (kfinn, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Alfred Jay Adamson against Michael J. Astrue re: 16 Order, by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 09/25/12. (alvsl)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/4/2011. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/3/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/18/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 8/26/2011. (sah2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Jay Adamson
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?