Lovato v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Louis Lovato
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv01354
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/20/12.(lygsl, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Commissioner's decision finding that Plaintiff did not become disabled until April 22, 2008 is REVERSED. Plaintiff has been disabled under Titles II and XVI of the Act since 4/1/17 and Plaintiff shall be awarded disability insurance benefits and supplemental security income consistent with this Order, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/15/12. (lygsl, )
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Caess (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/6/2011. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/7/2011. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/22/2011, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/6/11. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovato v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Lovato
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?