Federal Trade Commission et al v. Dalbey et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and State of Colorado
Defendant: Russell T. Dalbey, DEI, LLLP, Dalbey Education Institute, LLC, IPME, LLLP, Catherine L. Dalbey and Marsha Kellogg
Case Number: 1:2011cv01396
Filed: May 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0053
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting 312 Motion for Contempt by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/14/15.(jdyne, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting in part 304 Motion for Order of disgorgement. Final judgment to enter. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/6/2015.(tscha, )
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 293 Motion for Review, as outlined in the attached order, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/29/2014.(tscha, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: 293 Defendants Russell and Catherine Dalbey's Motion Challenging Plaintiffs' Determination of "Maximum Ability to Pay" Under Stipulated Judgment is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, written order to issue. Written decision is withheld for 10 days for the parties to try to come to a resolution. Court Reporter: Kara Spitler. (jdyne, )
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER re: 293 Amended MOTION for Review. Parties are to set the matter for an evidentiary hearing. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/22/14. (jdyne, )
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Stipulated ORDER for Final Judgment and Order for Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief as to Russell T. Dalbey and Catherine L. Dalbey re: 280 . By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/17/13.(alvsl)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER on Pending Motions. 229 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; 231 Motion to Exclude is DENIED; 233 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; 234 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/11/13. (alvsl)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MINUTE ORDER granting 222 Joint Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to Depose Michael Friedhaber After the Discovery Cut-off Date and to Strike the Evidentiary Hearing Set for October 23, 2012, VACATED; Discovery extended to 9/25/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs pending oral Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production No. 3 and Interrogatory No. 1 see Docket No. 220 is deemed WITHDRAWN, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/2012.(ervsl, )
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Minute ORDER. ORDERED that the Opposed Motion 211 is deemed WITHDRAWN. FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Motion 215 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is extended to 8/29/12. FURTHER ORDERED that the Discovery Deadline is extended to 9/24/12, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/22/12.(lygsl, )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER denying 144 defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 149 Defendants Objection to Magistrate Judge Mixs January 5, 2012 Order by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/15/2012.(ervsl, )
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ENTRY for Oral Argument Hearing held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/11/2012.Taking under advisement 144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(Court Reporter: Kara Spitler) (lag)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS CONTAINING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/9/2012. (klmcd, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 159 Motion for Protective Order. No Party or Third Party shall file a contested discovery motion until after complying with the steps for following the Magistrate Judge's discovery dispute procedure, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/5/12.(lsw, )
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re: 147 Notice of Filing Declarations Supporting Attorneys' Fees and Costs Relating to the No Show Deposition of Stephen M. Nowlis, Ph.D. ORDERED that the Dalbey Defendants shall remit a payment of $12,753.48 to Plaintiff FTC. ORDERED that the Dalbey Defendants shall remit a payment of $2,384.02 to Plaintiff COAG, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/9/12. (lsw, )
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER re: 120 Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Demand and Several Affirmative Defenses, and Motion for a More Definite Statement With Respect to Some Affirmative Defenses. The Motion is DENIED as moot in part, DENIED in part, and GRANTED in part. Defendants' Third Affirmative Defense regarding statute of limitations is stricken as to Plaintiffs' Section 13(b) claim only, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/5/12.(lsw, )
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 110 Motion for Sanctions. ORDERED that the Defendant Dalbeys shall pay any costs associated with the deposition, including Plaintiffs travel expenses and reasonable attorneys' fees. Defendant Dalbeys shall pay Plaintiffs' reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in drafting the Motion 110 and Reply 126 , by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/21/11.(lsw, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL PRETRIAL/TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: A two-week Bench Trial is set for 1/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. A Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/4/2013 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/13/2011. (rbjsec. )
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER; 131 Joint Motion to Add Signatories to Protective Order Regarding Documents Containing Sensitive Personal Identifiers is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order with Additional Signatures)(klmcd, )
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER granting 118 Motion to Clarify. The portion of the Court's Minute Order 112 asserting that Attorney Barron and Attorney Goteiner ever represented or would continue to represent the Entity Defendants is VACATED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to remove Attorney Goteiner's name from the electronic certificate of mailing. Granting 119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Deborah Kristina Barron terminated, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/17/11.(lsw, )
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF AS TO DEFENDANT RUSSELL T. DALBEY. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/11/2011.(sah, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice as moot 80 Motion to Exclude; granting 109 Motion to Withdraw Document. The Status Report Deadline with respect to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 set for 10/25/2011 is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/6/11.(lsw, )
September 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 96 Motion to Quash. Neither party shall file a contested discovery motion until after unsuccessfully conferring with the other party and receiving leave from the Court to file the motion, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/26/11.(lsw, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS CONTAINING SENSITIVE PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/28/2011. (klmcd )
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Stipulated Final ORDER for 19 Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief as to Defendant Marsha Kellogg. (See Order for Details) by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 66/2011.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Dalbey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Alysa S. Bernstein
Represented By: David P. Frankel
Represented By: Michelle Robyn Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Jay Beebe Simonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell T. Dalbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEI, LLLP
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalbey Education Institute, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPME, LLLP
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine L. Dalbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Kellogg
Represented By: Michael Yaghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?