Huffman v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Loral Huffman
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons and Harvey Lappin
Case Number: 1:2011cv01459
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Adopting and Affirming 309 Report and Recommendations: 229 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted, and this case is dismissed without prejudice. 224 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs Motions for Preliminary Injunction, 297 and 306 , are denied as moot. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/4/13.(dkals, )
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 289 Motion for 60-Day Extension, 292 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 294 Motion for Contempt, 295 Motion for Documents, 299 Motion for Contempt of Court, and 303 Motion for Status, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/10/13.(dkals, )
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MINUTE ORDER granting 281 Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/13/12.(dkals, )
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MINUTE ORDER denying 267 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/20/12.(dkals, )
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MINUTE ORDER striking 251 Motion for Order; striking 252 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; striking 253 Motion for Contempt; striking 254 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; striking 255 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; s triking 256 Motion to Clarify; striking 257 Motion for Order; striking 258 Motion for Order; striking 259 Motion for Order; striking 260 Motion for Order; striking 261 Motion to Stay; striking 262 Motion to Stay; striking 263 Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/16/12.(dkals, )
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice a 246 letter from Plaintiff, filed by the Clerk's Office as a Motion to Reinstate Bureau of Prisons as a Defendant. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/19/12.(mnfsl, )
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 239 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/18/12.(mnfsl, )
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 231 Motion for Copy of Response and 232 Motion to Be Provided File are granted in part and denied in part. The 233 Motion to Correct Record is denied. The 234 Motion to Reinstate BOP as Defendant is denied. The 235 to Serve 2 Amended Complaints is denied without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/13/12.(mnfsl, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER granting 226 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment Concerning Lack of Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) 224 and to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 226 -1 on or before 7/6/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/5/12.(mnfsl, )
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MINUTE ORDER denying 220 Plaintiff's Motion to Find BOP in Contempt of Court. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/29/12.(mnfsl, )
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER denying without prejudice 215 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 70 Amended Complaint on or before 6/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/17/12.(mnfsl, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 208 Motion of Status and Clarifications, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/27/2012.(jjpsl, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTE ORDER striking 205 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt of Court. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/23/12.(mnfsl, )
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 193 Motion to Dismiss; granting 201 Motion for Extension of Time.The Court imposes a sixty-day temporary STAY OF PROCEEDINGS, which will expire on 5/2/2012. Plaintiff must file a Status Report by 5/2/2012. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2012 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/2/2012.(jjpsl, ) Modified on 3/2/2012 to correct text (jjpsl, ).
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 174 Order to Produce; denying 177 Motion for Contempt; denying 178 Motion For Holding Defendants for Obstructing Justice; denying as moot 179 Motion to Defendant in Contempt of Court. Defendants shall file a Status Report by 1/31/2012. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/23/12.(jjpsl, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER denying 131 Motion for Order; denying 170 Motion for Leave. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/17/12.(cmacd )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MINUTE ORDER denying 166 Motion Order [sic] of 6 Month Forensic Evaluation, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/10/12.(jjpsl, )
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 158 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. The 159 Motion for Copy of the Entire File is granted in part. The 160 Motion for Extension and Copy of Affidavit is granted in part and denied as moot in all other aspects. The 161 Motion to Clarify Date is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/30/11.(mnfsl, )
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 154 Notice of Appeal by Loral Huffman, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/29/11. (bjrsl, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER AFFIRMING 12/8/11 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE denying 80 Emergency Injuction Motion to Find Defendants in Contempt of Court; adopting 140 Report and Recommendations.; denying without prejudice 152 Motion for Order titled Response to Government Response - Obstruction of Justice, Reconsideration of Reommendation of Judge Mix, Plaintiff's Objection to Judge Mix Future Adjudication, Plaintiff's Motion for Perjury Charges. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/28/2011.(jjpsl, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 144 Plaintiff's Motion to Explain Marshals [sic] Refusal to Serve. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/19/11.(mnfsl, )
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MINUTE ORDER denying 129 Plaintiff's Motion for Right to Respond to Government. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/2/11.(mnfsl, )
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MINUTE ORDER denying 122 Plaintiff's Denied Court Access; granting 123 Motion for Clarificaton; denying 124 Motion for Verification. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/30/11.(mnfsl, )
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER striking 110 Plaintiff's Request Temporary Relief Declaration. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/28/2011.(jjpsl, )
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED ORDER 118 ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING OCTOBER 31, 2011 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/22/2011. (jjpsl, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING OCTOBER 31, 2011 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 62 Motion for TRO; denying 64 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 74 Motion for TRO; adopting re 76 Report and Recommendations. Magistrate Judges Order denying Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Doc. 73 is AFFIRMED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/21/2011.(jjpsl, )
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTE ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and denying without prejudice in part 104 letter from Plaintiff docketed as a motion by the Clerk's Office. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/15/11.(mnfsl, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 99 Notice of Appeal by Loral Huffman, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/14/11. (bjr, )
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Plaintiff's case will be placed on the list of cases available for volunteer counsel. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/10/11. (mnfsl, )
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER striking 88 Plaintiff's Information for Temporary Restraining Order pursuant to this Court's 85 Minute Order issued 11/4/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/9/11.(mnfsl, )
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER. The 81 Motion to Serve Amended Claims is denied as moot. The document entitled 82 Emergency Injunction is denied as moot and will be considered in conjunction with Plaintiff's 80 Emergency Injunction Motion to Find Defendant s in Contempt of Court. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's 80 Emergency Injunction Motion to Find Defendants in Contempt of Court and accompanying 83 Affidavit on or before 11/21/2011. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/4/11.(mnfsl, ) (Main Document 85 replaced on 11/4/2011) (wjcsl, ). Modified on 11/4/2011 to attach the correct PDF (wjc, ).
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshall re: 1 Complaint filed by Loral Huffman by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/24/2011. (Attachments: # 1 certified mail address label) (erv, )
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Drawing Case to A District Judge and a Magistrate Judge. The John and/or Jane Does Defendants who are implicated in the claims which are bases on conduct that occured outside of Colorado and who resided outside of Colorad o during the time period relevant to the Complaint are DISMISSED. The second claim for relief (equal protection claim) and the portions of claims one, three, four, and five that are based on conduct occuring outside of Colorado are dismissed. The Inf ormation [Motion] for Temporary Restraining Order 54 , Information [Motion] for Temporary Restraining Order 55 , Information [Motion] for Temporary Restraining Order 56 , are DENIED. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/20/2011.(sah, )
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 49 Motion for TRO; denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/13/11.(lsw, )
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/16/11. (lsw, )
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court send a copy of the instant Order to the USP-Florence Warden. FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days from the date of this Order, the USP-Florence Warden assist the Court in: (1) determining the validity of the denial of Mr. Huffman's request and in obtaining a certified copy of his account statement; and, (2) determining the validity of Mr. Huffman's claim that he is unable to access funds in his inmate account, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/27/11. (lyg, )
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the document titled "Motion to Seal - Reconsideration" 10 , by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/29/11. (lsw, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: denying 25 Motion to Vacate June 29th Hearing. The telephonic hearing will go forward on June 29, 2011, at 9:00 a.m. as planned, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/2811.(bnbcd, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Allow Limited Dissemination of Sealed Document. Counsel for the Bureau of Prisons is permitted to provide copies of 10 to the Bureau attorney assigned to the case, the Bureau supervisory attorney, a member of Special Investigative Services, and a member of Plaintiff's Unit Team, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/27/11.(lygsl, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/15/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loral Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Mustafa Ahmed Hersi
Represented By: Amy L. Padden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?