Velez v. D.O.C. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Velez
Defendant: D.O.C., D.W.C.F. and Chavez
Case Number: 1:2011cv01565
Filed: June 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaustadministrative remedies. Defendants' motion is DENIED AS MOOT on all othergrounds. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/11/12.(cmacd )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and Vacate 02/09/2012 Scheduling Conference. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set before Magistrate Judge Watanabe on 02/09/2012 at 10:30 AM is VACATED. This case is STAYED pending ruling on the 30 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/02/2012.(wjc, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The 18 Order of Reference to Magistrate Judge, entered by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/11/2011, is VACATED. Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland is designated to convene such settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/21/2011. (wjc, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/11/11. (jjh, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Drawing Case. Case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/6/11. (gmssl, )
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/22/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez v. D.O.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W.C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?