Mente v. Eagle's Nest Village Center Partners, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Michele Mente
Defendant: Eagle's Nest Village Center Partners, L.L.C.
Thirdparty_defendant: Miek Enterprises, Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Eagle's Nest Village Center Partners, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01767
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE granting 60 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. All claims asserted in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/2/12.(mjgsl, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order With Respect to Expert Testimony. Plaintiff's expert designations due by 5/15/2012. Defendants' expert designations due by 6/15/2012. Rebuttal expert designations due by 7/1/2012. Discovery due by 7/1/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/13/2012. (mehcd)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order with Respect to Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. Deadline for Plaintiff's expert disclosures: 04/15/2012. Deadline for Defendant's and Third Party Defendant's expert disclosures: 05/15/2012. Deadline for designation of rebuttal experts: 06/01/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 02/23/2012.(wjc, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff Michele Mente's (Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint in Order to Assert Claims Against Third Party Defendant, Commercial Building Services, Inc. The Court accepts 34 Plaintiff's F irst Amended Complaint and Jury Demand as filed. In addition, the deadline for amendment of pleadings in this case is extended to 1/20/2012, the date on which Plaintiff filed this motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/24/2012. (mehcd)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Defendant's (Unopposed) Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint Against Commercial Building Services, Inc. Defendant shall serve the Third-Party Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/2011. (mehcd)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/18/11. (msksec, )
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/20/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mente v. Eagle's Nest Village Center Partners, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Miek Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle's Nest Village Center Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sara E. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Eagle's Nest Village Center Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sara E. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Mente
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?