Patterson v. Santini et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Lee Patterson
Defendant: George Santini and Camacho
Case Number: 1:2011cv01899
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER; Defendants' 146 Motion to Permit Their Counsel toAppear By Telephone at the March 28, 2016 Preliminary Scheduling Conference is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/24/16.(morti, )
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER OVERRULING re: 141 Objections filed by Gerald Lee Patterson by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 02/03/2016. (cthom, )
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's two motions titled "Verified Renewed Motion to Recuse Magistrate Mix" (ECF Nos. 134 , 139 ) are both DENIED, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2016.(agarc, )
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying without prejudice 128 Motion to Recuse Magistrate Mix; granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Reopen Case As Tenth Circuit Ordered And Recuse Magistrate Mix. Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks to reope n this case; based on the Tenth Circuits November 12, 2015 Order and Judgment, it is ORDERED this case be REOPENED to allow the parties to litigate the merits of Plaintiffs claims. Plaintiffs motion is DENIED without prejudice to the extent it seeks to have Magistrate Judge Mix recused, and Plaintiffs motion is DENIED without prejudice to the extent it seeks to have this Court compel Assistant U.S. Attorney Mark Pestal respond to Plaintiffs settlement offer, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 01/05/2016.(cthom, )
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re: 126 USCA Order; the Court ORDERS that all claims against the above named Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall pay their own costs and fees. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/28/2015. (cthom, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER : DENIES Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Reopen Case for Good Cause 114 , Plaintiff's Motion to Grant Unapposed (sic) Motion to Reopen Case 115 and Plaintiff's Motion for Rule to Show Cause 118 . By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/15/2015.(tscha, )
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 110 Motion to Reopen Case. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/5/2014.(tscha, )
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/23/14. Advisement Regarding Monthly Updates and Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt 106 is DENIED without prejudice. (lgale)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying 105 Motion for Clarification by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/9/14.(dkals, )
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Stipulated Motion for Administrative Closure, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/31/2014.(trlee, )
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER granting 98 Motion for Leave to appear by video conference or telephone, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/27/2014.(trlee, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Stay. Scheduling Conference is now set for 2/12/2014, 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/31/2014.(trlee, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER denying 73 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 85 Motion to Vacate 1/7/2014 settlement conference. A TELEPHONE Status Conference is set for 1/27/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Counsel for Defendants shall conference with Plaintiff and his case manager prior to contacting the Court at (303) 335-2770 on the above date and time in order to participate by telephone. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/2/2014.(trlee, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 54 Request for Submission for Decision and 56 Renewed Request for Submission for Decision. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/15/13.(mnfsl, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER denying 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/11/13.(mnfsl, )
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Permission to File a Surreply. Plaintiff's 49 Surreply to Defendants' Reply is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/9/13.(mnfsl, )
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 USCA ORDER on 9/17/12 re: 41 Notice of Writ of Mandamus filed by Gerald Lee Patterson. Motion to Dismiss is granted. (lswsl, )
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The 24 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is accepted. Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss is denied. On or before 9/20/2012, defendants shall file a response to the Amended Prisoner Complaint. Plaintiff's 38 , 39 Requests to Submit for Decision are denied as moot. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/6/12.(mnfsl, )
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay. Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/12 is VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/11/12.(cmacd )
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/8/12.(mnfsl, )
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Service by United States Marshal. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/30/11. (Attachments: # 1 Process Receipt and Return, # 2 Certified Mail - Receipt)(mnf, )
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/26/2011. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Santini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Lee Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Santini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?