USA v. $430,346.00 Seized from American National Bank Account #70659944 et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $430,346.00 Seized from American National Bank Account #70659944 and $22,678.00 Seized from American National Bank Account #52005163
Claimant: Elizabeth Melahn and Tan Your Hide II, Inc
Case Number: 1:2011cv02068
Filed: August 8, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981 Civil Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE granting 30 Motion for Final Order of Forfeiture, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/22/2015.(dhans, )
October 14, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Reopen Case, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/14/2015.(cthom, )
January 27, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 the Governments Unopposed Motion for Order to Administratively Close Case pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. The parties are GRANTED leave to move to reopen the case upon a showing of good cause. by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/27/2012. (ervsl, )
November 7, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Claimants' Unopposed Motion for Stay. The proceedings in this action are stayed pending further order of the Court. Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2011. (mehcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $430,346.00 Seized from American National Bank Account #70659944 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $430,346.00 Seized from American National Bank Account #70659944
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,678.00 Seized from American National Bank Account #52005163
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Elizabeth Melahn
Represented By: Joseph H. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tan Your Hide II, Inc
Represented By: Joseph H. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?