Otter Products, LLC v. Treefrog Developments Inc.
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Defendant: Treefrog Developments Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02180
Filed: August 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 139 Defendant Lifeproofs Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order, for Additional Markman Argument, and for Leave to File Early Summary Judgment Motion, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/7/2013.(ervsl, )
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 116 Plaintiff Otter Products, LLCs (OtterBoxs)Motion to Consolidate (Motion). It is therefore ORDERED that Civil Action No. 12-cv-03115-WJM-KMT shall be consolidated with Consolidated Civil Action No. 1:11-cv-02180-WJM-KMT for all p urposes, and future filings in this action shall contain the caption as set forth above and shall be docketed under Civil Action No. 1:11-cv-02180-WJM-KMT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that U.S. Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya will remain as the sole referral Magistrate Judge in the consolidated action. Magistrate Judge Tafoya will remain designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) (1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b), by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/7/2013.(ervsl, ) (Modified on 2/7/2013 edited to reflect NDISPO)(ervsl, ). (Main Document 131 replaced on 2/7/2013) (ervsl, ).
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER granting 106 Plaintiff Otter Products, LLCs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Defendants Counterclaims, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/24/2012.(ervsl, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER That Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendant Counterclaim Nos. I-V or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate Discovery & Adjudication of Same ECF No. 39 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Plaintiffs Motion is granted only in that, if this ca se reaches trial, the Court, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, will first hold a trial on Plaintiffs patent infringement claims against Defendant, along with Defendants Sixth and Seventh Counterclaims against Plaintiff (non-infringem ent and invalidity, respectively). And then, if necessary, the Court will hold a separate, later trial on Defendants First, Second, Third, Fourth, and Fifth Counterclaims against Plaintiff; and In all other respects, Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED. by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/28/2012.(ervsl, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/27/2012. (ervsl, )
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2012, granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Compel. 66 Motion for Ruling is held in abeyance pending further briefing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (kmtcd)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/10/2012. (kmtcd)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 32 the Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order, and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/4/2011.(ervsl, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC and Defendant Treefrog Developments Inc.'s Joint Motion of Dismissal of certain claims and counterclaims. by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/19/2011.(ervsl, )
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Regarding Electronic Discovery by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/14/2011. (kmtcd)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiffs Motion to File a First Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/7/2011.(ervsl, )
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2011 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/26/2011. (kmtcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otter Products, LLC v. Treefrog Developments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Represented By: Rachael Dauphine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treefrog Developments Inc.
Represented By: Ian Richard Walsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?