Franks v. North American Asset Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deja Franks
Defendant: North American Asset Services, LLC and Salvatore Mazzara
Case Number: 1:2011cv02323
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. The 51 Order to Show Cause is discharged. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/8/12. (mnfsl, )
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. Plaintiff's 46 Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs is granted. Plaintiff's 47 Request for Entry of Bill of Costs is denied. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/7/12.(mnfsl, )
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The plaintiff shall file a fee application, if at all, on or before May 24, 2012. The defendant shall respond to the fee application on or before May 31, 2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/10/12. (bnbcd, )
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: denying AS WITHDRAWN 28 Motion to Compel Better Answers from Defendant North American Asset Services, LLC. The motions hearing set for April 2, 2012, is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/28/12.(bnbcd, )
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 10 Defendants' Motion to Strike Paragraphs...of Plaintiff Deja Franks' Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/13/2011.(wjc, )
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/7/11. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. North American Asset Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Asset Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Mazzara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deja Franks
Represented By: Craig J. Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?