Sopack v. Greasley
Plaintiff: John Sopack
Defendant: Ronald L. Greasley
Case Number: 1:2011cv02334
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 31 Stipulated Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice; the Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/16/2012 is VACATED; the jury trial set to commence 12/10/2012 is VACATED and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/19/2012. (klyon, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/16/2012 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 12/10/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/24/12. (rebsec, )
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/14/2011. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sopack v. Greasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Greasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sopack
Represented By: Kenneth Alfredo Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?