Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Original Honeybaked Ham Company of Georgia, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Original Honeybaked Ham Company of Georgia, Inc., The
Case Number: 1:2011cv02560
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER denying without prejudice 325 Plaintiff EEOC's Motion for Reconsideration of Costs, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/27/2013. (mehcd)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 2/21/2013, taking under advisement 267 Defendant HBH's Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 against Plaintiff EEOC for Failure to Comply in Good Faith with the Court's Order. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER denying Defendant's 142 Motion to Strike. The Court DECLINES to adopt the Recommendation (# 223 ) and OVERRULES the EEOC's Objections (# 238 ). The Motion to Strike (# 142 ) is DENIED, with leave to renew as a motion in limine with regard to the evidence to be presented at trial. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/13/2013.(klyon, )
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 323 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2013, granting in part and denying in part 276 Plaintiff EEOC's Motion for Resolution of Discovery Dispute and Propose d Protocol and Search Term List. Plaintiff EEOC's brief regarding apportionment of costs for the Special Master and production of electronically stored information, as well as the proposed order for the Court's signature regarding discover y ordered today, is due by close of business on 2/20/2013; Defendant's response to apportionment of costs is due by noon (12:00 p.m. Mountain Time) on 2/22/2013. Oral Argument on 267 Defendant HBH's Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ . P. 37 against Plaintiff EEOC for Failure to Comply in Good Faith with the Court's Order set for 2/21/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/25/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 107 and 138 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Orders on Motions to Compel. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/4/2013.(klyon, )
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/18/2013, granting in part and holding in abeyance in part 292 Motion for Stay of Discovery by Intervenor Plaintiff. Counsel shall file a joint supplement to 259 the EEOC Motion for Protective Order as to Defendant's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, identifying the remaining topics. Plaintiff's request for a complete employee list for District 8 is denied. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS: The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 42 is DENIED, but the EEOC's claims are limited to: (1) sex discrimination resulting from a hostile work environment created by Mr. Jackman in District 8, and (2) retaliation against employees who engaged in protected activity in complaining of Mr. Jackman's harassment. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/15/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 1/14/2013, denying 254 EEOC's Motion for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Lowell Pate. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/28/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 269 Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Against Plaintiff for Failure to Comply in Good Faith with the Court's Order and Amended Order on Motion to Compel. However, Defendant may file a motion to restrict access concerning Exhibits A and D on or before 1/16/2013, in accordance with D.C. Colo. LCivR 7.2 and all applicable local and federal rules. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain under restriction those documents identified as Exhibits A [268-1] and D [268-2] until further order of the Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/9/2013. (mehcd)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ORDER. Status Conference set for 1/7/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2013. (klyon, )
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 247 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/15/12. (msksec, )
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 AMENDED ORDER re: 177 Defendant HBH's Motion to Compel, replacing the appointment of a Special Master with the designation of Mr. Wojtusik, the EEOC Litigation Support Manager, who will conduct the same duties as the SpecialMaster, at the cost of the EEOC (utilizing outside vendors as necessary). By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/2012. (mehcd)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 177 Defendant HBH's Motion to Compel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2012. (mehcd)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 AMENDED COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: The document at 177 is amended to reflect the correct hearing date of November 6, 2012. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Defendant's Motion to Strike Strike Catherine Vigil, Shannon Kennedy, Kelly Teegarden and Lisa Jager as Allegedly Aggrieved Individuals, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2012. (mehcd)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER denying as 146 the Emergency Motion for Protective Order Regarding the Depositions of Timothy Franklin, Ray Olson, Don Welch and Long Armstrong, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/27/2012. (mehcd)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 178 Motion to Amend Plaintiff Intervenor Complaint and Jury Trial Demand to Plead State Law Exemplary Damages. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/11/2012.(klyon, )
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 173 Defendant's [Redacted] Motion to Compel Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/10/2012. (mehcd)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 157 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and this matter is consolidated with Civil Action No. 12- cv-02137-MSK. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty shall preside over both matters, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/31/2012.(ervsl, )
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying 143 the Motion by Defendant HoneyBaked Ham and "Third Party" James Jackman for an Order Allowing Mr. Jackman to Attend the Depositions of Allegedly Aggrieved Individuals, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/13/2012. (mehcd)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER re: 135 Plaintiffs' partially unopposed Motion for Ninety-Day Extension of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2012, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/01/2012.(wjcsl, )
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Plaintiff EEOC's Second Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/18/2012. (mehcd)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER granting 100 Defendant's Motion to File Surreply, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/25/2012. (mehcd)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF REMITTANCE Re: U.S. District Court, District of South Dakota, CIV. 12-mc-14, by Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 04/13/2012. (wjcsl, ) (Main Document 66 replaced on 4/13/2012) (wjcsl, ). Modified on 4/13/2012 to replace PDF with filed stamp (wjcsl, ).
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and denying without prejudice in part 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and for Issuance of Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/19/2012. (mehcd)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(1). The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Intervenor Complaint and Jury Trial Demand found at docket # 7 -1, and to amend the case caption accordingly, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/30/2011.(wjc, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/6/11. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Original Honeybaked Ham Company of Georgia, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Original Honeybaked Ham Company of Georgia, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Iris Halpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?