Wellinger Family Trust 1998, The et al v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wellinger Family Trust 1998, The, Julie Wellinger and Julie (I) Wellinger
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv02568
Filed: September 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/24/13. The Final Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Trial are vacated, this case is dismissed, and Defendant shall have its costs.(dkals, )
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Settlement Conference will not be scheduled at this time. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/25/13. (bnbcd, )
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 81 Motion to Compel. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/5/13.(bnbcd, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2013. 81 Motion to Compel Harford to Produce Relevant Privilege Log Item isTAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, written order to issue. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 72 Plaintiff's Unopposed Supplemental Motion for In Camera Review of Two Privilege Log Items. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/2/13.(bnbcd, )
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: 48 Unopposed Motion for In Camera Review of Disputed Items From Defendant's Privilege Log is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 52 Amended Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Written Discovery is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Supplemental discovery responses due by 3/1/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/21/13. (bnbcd, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2013. 48 Motion for In Camera Inspection is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 52 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FTR: BNB Courtroom A401. (bnbcd, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER to Dismiss Claim re: 55 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Claim for Relief by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/5/13.(dkals, )
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/11/12. (bnbcd, )
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 41 Stipulated Motion to Amend Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 1/25/2013, and Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2013. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/6/12.(dkals, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: 37 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Discovery due by 11/30/2012, Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2012, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/7/12.(bnbcd, )
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/13/12.(sgrim)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Stiipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The parties shall designate all rebuttal experts and provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before 6/13/2012. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/30/12.(mnfsl, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 14 Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Include Claims for Alternative Theories and Exemplary Damages; granting 21 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/30/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/30/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/23/12.(bnbcd, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/2011. (ervsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellinger Family Trust 1998, The et al v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellinger Family Trust 1998, The
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Swett
Represented By: Charles Langford Sisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Wellinger
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Swett
Represented By: Charles Langford Sisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie (I) Wellinger
Represented By: Charles Langford Sisk
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Swett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristin Jeanette Mack
Represented By: Kevin Emmett O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?