Rivera v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Maria Rivera
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2011cv02585
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party bears its own attorney fees and costs by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/20/12. (jjhsl, )
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Stipulated Agreement and PROTECTIVE ORDER for Confidentiality of Information, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/21/2012. (klmcd, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Clarify 22 is GRANTED IN PARTand DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Modify 29 is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/9/12.(sgrim) Modified on 7/9/2012 to add document links. (sgrim, ).
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Modify the Supplement Administrative Record by 04/13/12 by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 03/19/12.(jjhsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael S. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rivera
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?