Martin v. Kraal
Plaintiff: Delores Martin
Defendant: Austin Kraal
Case Number: 1:2011cv02611
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 46 Motion to Dismiss Defendant With Prejudice is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The trial preparation conference scheduled for 6/10/2013 at 3:30 PM and the jury trial scheduled for 6/25/2013 are vacated. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/10/13. (mnfsl, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Three-day Jury Trial set for 6/10/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/17/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/17/13. (mnfsl, )
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. Upon the filing of the 23 Notice of Dismissal, this action was dismissed without prejudice as to defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/7/12. (mnfsl, )
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Upon the filing of the 17 Notice of Dismissal, this action was dismissed without prejudice as to defendant Austin Kraal. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/13/12. (mnfsl, )
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. 10 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is accepted as filed. Status Conference set for 4/12/2012 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/9/2012. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Kraal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Martin
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Kraal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?