Fresquez v. Minks et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Damasio Fresquez
Defendant: Ted Minks, Michael Fish, Martinalli, G. Gittins, Lucas, Renfro, Troy Betka, Scott Happ, Holloway, Steven Wygant, Kent Ferris, Kathrine Feroe, Crumbaker, Todd Wadley, Ryan Viers, Dustin Dyeling, Antony Kotris, Donald Springfield, Holley, James Geleude, Jason Richardson, Reid Perry, William Bohm, Erik Bougham, Herbert Longshore, Collins, Debra Eludo, Tahnee, Chantel Corkle, Kovi Kiel, Douglas K. Wilson, Dennis Hall, Writer Mott, Laura Wassmuth, Correctional Healthcare Management, Claudia Van Buren, Raymond Herr, Tracy Haines, Kathrine Becerra and Maria Rostad
Case Number: 1:2011cv02712
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice 206 is granted. That any pending motion, including but not limited to CHC's Partial Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief Based Upon Alleged Violations of 42 U.S.C.  7; 1983 187 filed January 16, 2015, is denied as moot. That all pending pretrial deadlines are vacated. That the combined Final Pretrial Conference/Trial Preparation Conference set January 22, 2016, is vacated.That the jury trial set to commence February 8, 2016, is vacated. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/2015.(mlace, )
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MINUTE ORDER granting 197 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/3/2015.(alowe)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Motions due by 9/2/2015. 5-Day Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/17/2015. (alowe) Modified on 2/17/2015 to correct courtroom number (alowe).
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER. Motion for Protective Order 170 is DENIED without prejudice, and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/14.(sgrim)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER denying 140 Motion for [Full Record] Be Transmitted Pursuant Rule 24(c) Fed. R. App. P. and Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 753(f). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/13/2014.(klyon, )
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 JUDGMENT by Clerk ENTERED in favor of each of the defendants against the plaintiff, Leroy Damasio Fresquez. The Jefferson County Sheriff Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; the CHM Defendants' Combined Motion and Brief to Dismiss Sec ond Amended Prisoner's Complaint 80 is GRANTED; the claims against the unnamed defendants are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted; all claims against all defendants, as alleged in the plaintiff's Second Amended Prisoner's Complaint 17 , are DISMISSED; the defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the clerk of the court. By Clerk on 3/20/13. (kfinn, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER ADOPTING 130 RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; the objections to the recommendation stated in plaintiff's paper 132 are overruled; Jefferson County Sheriff Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P . 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 54 is GRANTED; CHM Defendants' Combined Motion and Brief to Dismiss Second Amended Prisoner's Complaint 80 is GRANTED; all claims against all defendants, as alleged in the plaintiff's Second Amended Prisoner 's Complaint 17 , are DISMISSED; Motion for Leave to Amend Second Amended Prisoners [sic] Complaint 85 is DENIED; JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of each of the defendants against the plaintiff; defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the clerk of the court. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/13. (kfinn, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 80 , 96 and Jefferson County Sheriff Defendants (sic) [Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss], as Untimely 105 is DENIED. Court further respectfu lly RECOMMENDS Motion to Dismiss 54 be GRANTED; Combined Motion and Brief to Dismiss Second Amended Prisoner's Complaint 80 be GRANTED; and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Second Amended Prisoners (sic) Complaint 85 be DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/6/13. (kfinn, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting in part 87 Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/29/12.(dkals, )
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Plaintiff's Motion. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED to the extent that Plaintiff seeks addresses for Defendants Herr and Correctional Healthcare Management. The docket indicates that these defendants were served on May 2, 2012. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED in part to the extent it seeks addresses for Defendants Van Buren and Becerra. No later than May 25, 2012, Defendants shall file a Status Report either (1) advising the court of forwarding addresses for Defendants Van Buren and Becerra, or (2) advising the court that Defendants and Defendants' counsel do not have access to, or record of, such addresses. If the Status Report indeed includes forwarding addresses for Defendants Van Buren and Becerra, it shall be filed under Restricted Access Level 2, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/18/12.(mjgsl, ) (mjgsl, )
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Motion which seeks a copy of his (Plaintiff's) SecondAmended Prisoner Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/18/12.(mjgsl, )
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks state court hearings transcripts, Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. No. 33 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff seeks copies of his initial Prisoner Complaint (Doc. No. 1 , filed Oct. 18, 2011) and his Amended Prisoner Complaint (Doc. No. 9 , filed Dec. 12, 2011). by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/9/12.(mjgsl, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw In Part to District Judge and Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that Defendants Chantel Corkle, Douglas K. Wilson, Writer Mott, Laura Wassmuth, and Dennis Hall are dismissed from the action and the claims asserted against them are dismissed as legally frivolous. FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint with respect to the remaining Defendants shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Fresquez is directed to submit a certified account statement by 4/2/12, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/22/12. (lygsl, )
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/6/12. (lygsl, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/16/11. (lygsl, )
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/2/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresquez v. Minks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Damasio Fresquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Minks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Gittins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renfro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Betka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Happ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wygant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathrine Feroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crumbaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Wadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Viers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Dyeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Kotris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Geleude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reid Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Bougham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Eludo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahnee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantel Corkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kovi Kiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas K. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Writer Mott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Wassmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathrine Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Rostad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?