Conyac v. Noonan et al
Plaintiff: Edward Peter Conyac
Defendant: Fred Hudson, Jessica Zaines, Noonan and Deanne Romero
Case Number: 1:2011cv02730
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 46 Order. By Clerk on 8/21/13. (mnfsl, )
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ACCEPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RECOMMENDATION. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 45 is ACCEPTED. This case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service of process, failure to identify anonymous parties, and failure to prosecute. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/16/2013.(cmacd)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER directing Mr. Conyac to submit additional information on or before Monday, July 1, 2013, to enable service of process on Defendants by the U.S. Marshal. If Mr. Conyac does not submit such additional information, the court will issue a Recommen dation to District Judge Philip A. Brimmer that this civil action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to effect service of process, failure to identify anonymous parties, and failure to prosecute. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/03/2013. (cbslc1)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT HUDSON ONLY. The 30 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against Defendant Hudson is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted in this matter against defendant Fred Hudson only are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/16/12.(mnfsl, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/22/12. (lsw, )
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/19/12. (lsw, )
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/27/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conyac v. Noonan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Zaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanne Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Peter Conyac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?