Grier v. Wendy's of Colorado Springs, Inc.
Plaintiff: JoBeth Grier
Defendant: Wendy's of Colorado Springs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02788
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. Four-day Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/8/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/5/12. (mnfsl, )
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/11/12. (cbssec)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/21/11. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grier v. Wendy's of Colorado Springs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoBeth Grier
Represented By: Donna E. Dell'Olio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy's of Colorado Springs, Inc.
Represented By: Susan F. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?