Rossi Ventures, Inc. et al v. Pasquini et al

Counter_claimant: Pasquini Franchising, LLC and Antonio Pasquini
Counter_defendant: Y. Melinda Pasquini and Rossi Ventures, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rossi Ventures, Inc. and Y. Melinda Pasquini
Defendant: Antonio Pasquini and Pasquini Franchising, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv02838
Filed: October 31, 2011
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2012 101 Featured Case ORDER denying 87 Motion to Clarify. Defendants shall immediately comply with the preliminary injuction. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/7/12.(dkals, )
August 22, 2012 107 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 105 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discover Cut-Off is set for 12/14/12, Dispositive Motion Deadline is 1/14/13, and the proposed Pretrial Order is due 3/21/13. The Pretrial Conference is reset to 3/28/12 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A-401. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/22/12.(dkals, )
October 3, 2012 117 Featured Case Stipulation and Order Regarding Custody of Exhibits. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/3/12. (bnbcd, )
November 28, 2012 139 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT CITATION, CERTIFICATION OF FACTS, AND RELATED FILINGS. United States Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland's 118 Certification of Facts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(e) (6) is adopted in whole by this Court. Plaintiff s' 108 Motion for Contempt Citation is granted. Defendants Tony Pasquini's and Pasquini Franchising, LLCs 123 Objections to United States Magistrate Judges Certification of Facts Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(e)(6) are overruled. Plaintiffs' 127 Motion to Strike Defendants' Objections to Certification of Facts is denied as moot. Defendants' 129 Motion to Dissolve or Modify Injunction is denied. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/28/12.(mnfsl, )
January 3, 2013 155 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 148 Motion for Leave to Take Previously Noticed Third Party Depositions Outside of Discovery Time. Discovery extended to 1/31/13 solely to take the limited depositions of David Stark and John Marcil. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/3/13.(bnbcd, )
January 15, 2013 169 Featured Case ORDER on 163 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(c): Defendants' counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/15/13.(dkals, )
January 30, 2013 182 Featured Case ORDER denying 145 Motion to Stay Case Pending Appeal by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/30/12.(dkals, )
March 5, 2013 192 Featured Case ORDER granting 191 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Stay: the Pretrial Conference and Proposed Pretrial Order deadline are vacated, and this case is stayed for 21 days, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/5/13.(dkals, )
April 25, 2013 198 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/25/13. (dkals, )
December 20, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER : A three day Evidentiary Hearing is set for 2/21/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall complete their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures on or before January 10, 2012, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/20/11. (bnbcd, )
January 24, 2012 33 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/12. (bnbcd, )
February 10, 2012 39 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/10/12. (bnbcd, )
April 13, 2012 57 Featured Case ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 4/30/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/13/2012. (jjpsl, )
June 18, 2012 74 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: 71 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Clerk of Court to accept Amended Complaint and Demand for Injunctive Relief [71-1] for filing. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/18/12.(bnbcd )
June 28, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER adopting and affirming Report and Recommendations 56 , overrulling 56 Objection, denying 76 Motion for Leave, and granting 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/28/12.(dkals, )
July 2, 2012 81 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/2/12.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rossi Ventures, Inc. et al v. Pasquini et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Pasquini Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Shane Kato Crews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Antonio Pasquini
Represented By: Shane Kato Crews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Y. Melinda Pasquini
Represented By: Brittany A. Carver
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Cowman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rossi Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Brittany A. Carver
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Cowman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossi Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Cowman
Represented By: Brittany A. Carver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. Melinda Pasquini
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Cowman
Represented By: Brittany A. Carver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Pasquini
Represented By: Shane Kato Crews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquini Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Shane Kato Crews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]