United States of America v. Grynberg Petroleum Co.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Grynberg Petroleum Co.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02945
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/04/13. (jjhsl, )
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 18 the Governments Motion for Partial Summary Judgment;It is FURTHER ORDERED that Grynberg Petroleum Companys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 20 is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Government may not charge interest or assess a delinquent payment penalty against Grynberg Petroleum Company under 31 U.S.C. §§ 3717(a)(1) and (e), by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/3/2012.(ervsl, )
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. ORDERED that the United States Motion to Strike Defendant Grynberg Petroleum Company's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 21 is DENIED. ORDERED that Defendant Grynberg Petroleum Companys Motion for Leave to File Cross-Motion fo r Partial Summary Judgment 23 is GRANTED and Defendant's Cross- Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 20 is accepted as filed. ORDERED that the Government's Expedited, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 25 is GRANTED. The Government shall file its Response to Defendants Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on or before Wednesday, July 25, 2012. The Defendant shall file its Reply on or before Wednesday, August 8, 2012. The Government's Motion for Summary Judgment 7 is DENIED as MOOT by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/10/12.(jjhsl, )
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Scheduling Conference held on 4/23/2012. The court GRANTS 13 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The government shall file their motion requesting partial judgment on summa ry judgment no later than May 9, 2012; the defendant shall respond to this motion no later than June 11, 2012; the government shall file its reply no later than June 25, 2012. The court will stay all discovery pending ruling on the governments motion . The parties shall put together a conference call and then contact Magistrate Judge Shaffer's chambers (303.844.2117) within 72 hours of a ruling on this motion (if itis denied) to address further settings in this case. (FTR: Robin Mason) (cbscd, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 4/23/2012 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/6/12. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Grynberg Petroleum Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Franklin George Monsour, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grynberg Petroleum Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?