Etrick v. Dillard's, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paula Etrick
Defendant: Dillard's, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02958
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/30/2012 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 12/10/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/1/12. (rebsec, )
February 21, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 13 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/30/2012, is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 12/10/2012, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/21/2012. (sah, )
November 18, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. A Scheduling/Planning Conference is set for 1/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/18/2011. (sah, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etrick v. Dillard's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Etrick
Represented By: Gerald C. Sloat
Represented By: P. Randolph Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Kristen Brand
Represented By: Geoffrey Race
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.