Gatlin v. Holdridge et al
Plaintiff: Antwan Ocie Gatlin
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro, Ellen Haarmann, Jack Chapman, Chris Durga, Paul Dose, Larry Cox, Chad Penner, Mary Holdridge, Steve Brown, Jessica Jaramillo, Steve Brown, Jr., CCA, Barry Sloan and Colorado Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2011cv03004
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 FINAL JUDGMENT. re: Order Adopting April 4, 2014 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 168 . Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Chad Penner, Chris Durga, Ellen Haarmann, Jack Chapman, Jessica Jaramillo, Larry Cox, Paul Dose, Steve Brown, Jr, Steve Brown, Sr. and against Plaintiff Antwan Ocie Gatlin, by Deborah A. Hansen, Deputy Clerk, on 5/7/2014. (dhans, )
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Order to Depose. Defendants may take Plaintiffs deposition with regard to this litigation; granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time. The discovery deadline is extended to November 1, 2013, for the sole purpose of taking Plaintiffs deposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deposition shall take place at Arrowhead Correctional Center or, if Plaintiff is moved to a different correctional facility subsequent to this Order, at Plaintiffs new correctional facility. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/1/2013.(ervsl, )
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Denying in part and Denied without prejudice in part 118 Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Compel Disclosure and/or Discovery Response and for Appropriate Sanctions Deemed Fit By the Courts, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/2013.(ervsl, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion 97 is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and DENIED as moot in part; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send Plaintiff another hard copy of the Minutes (with attachments ) from the Scheduling Conference held on February 27, 2013 81 , #81-1, #81-2; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to File 89 is GRANTED. Defendants Motion to Amend 91 is accepted as timely filed; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Amend 91 is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/18/2013.(ervsl, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Plaintiffs Objections to the Magistrate Judges November 21, 2012 Recommendation ECF Nos. 68 & 71 are SUSTAINED; The Magistrate Judges November 21, 2012 Recommendation ECF No. 66 is ADOPTED with respect to Plaintiffs First and Fourteent h Amendment claim (Claim One) and REJECTED with respect to Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim (Claim Two); Defendants Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 24 & 38) are GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs First and Fourteenth Amendment claim (Claim One) and DENIED with respect to Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim (Claim Two); Plaintiffs First and Fourteenth Amendment claim (Claim One) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust; The Magistrate Judges September 25, 2012 Recommendation ECF N o. 60 is ADOPTED and Defendant Holdridge is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as a defendant; and The Magistrate Judge shall promptly set this matter for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and Local Rule 16.1, as this action remains pending as to Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim (Claim Two). y Judge William J. Martinez on 1/17/2013.(ervsl, )
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER; This matter is before the Court on the 24 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Jack Chapman, Steve Brown, Sr., Jessica Jaramillo, Ellen Haarmann, Larry Cox, Steve Brown, Jr., Chris Durga and on the 38 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Paul Dose, Chad Penner. It is hereby ORDERED that, if they so choose, the parties shall submit additional evidence regarding the failure to exhaust argument as presented in the Motions [24, 38] on or before 11/8/2012, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/19/2012. (klmcd, )
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Response and Request for Discovery and Extension by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/13/2012.(dkals, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw Case to A District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants Anthony DeCesaro, Barry Sloan, and John Doe Inspector General are dismissed as parties to this action. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/15/2012. (sah, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/4/12. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gatlin v. Holdridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Haarmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Durga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Penner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Holdridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Ocie Gatlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?