Hutchinson v. Houle et al
Plaintiff: John Hutchinson
Defendant: Houle, John Davis and Tom Clements
Case Number: 1:2011cv03108
Filed: November 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 56 , is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 48 is GRANTED IN PART; and This action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1M., by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/4/2013.(ervsl, )
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 58 Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. The parties shall file a status report with the Court indicating what, if any, changes to the Scheduling Order are needed, within five business days of a ruling on Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2013 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2013. (mehcd)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/28/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/2012. (mehcd)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 37 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 34 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant in his official capacity is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/31/2012.(ervsl, )
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Stay. Dispositive Motions due by 11/13/2012. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/10/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/09/12. (alvsl)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/25/2012. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 19 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. ORDERED: Defendant shall file an Answer or other response to the Amended Complaint on or before July 2, 2012.(wjmcd, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw in Part. The Complaint and claims asserted against Defendant Houle shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Defendants John Davis and Tom Clements are dismissed from the action, and the Clerk of the Court is instructed to remove them as named parties to this action. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/27/2012. (sah, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/18/12. (lsw, )
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/8/11. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Houle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?