Johnson v. Heinis et al
Plaintiff: Keith Allen Johnson
Defendant: Archer, Kevin Ujcich, Kevin Dreyfuss, John Ritter, City and County of Denver, Bryon Tompkins, Jeffery Heinis, Chris Cameron, Christopher Bales, Robert Greaser, Alexander St. Peter, Richard Harvey and Lance Gardner
Case Number: 1:2011cv03135
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MINUTE ORDER that in light of the Courts Order 111 that this action be Dismissed, the 105 Motion to Supplement;and 108 Motion for Extension of Time, are DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/2/2013.(ervsl, )
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 102 is ADOPTED; Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 79 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Motion for Continuance to Respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 107 is DENIED; Plaintiffs claims in this case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants; and All parties are to bear their own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/1/2013.(ervsl, )
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER; In light of the Court's Recommendation 102 that this action be dismissed, the Motions 58 60 63 66 68 77 81 83 87 92 94 94 96 are DENIED AS MOOT, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/29/2013.(klmcd, )
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 50 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/28/2012.(ervsl, )
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER; Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED. Defendant Heinis's 43 Motion to Deem Requests to Admit as Admitted is DENIED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/24/2012.(klmcd, )
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Adopting 34 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge; overruling 39 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Keith Allen Johnson, denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Reconsideration. By Judge William J. Martinez on 10/04/12. (alvsl)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Dismiss In Part and to Draw Case to a District Judge and to a Magistrate Judge. Defendants Regional Transportation District, Glen Washington, Joan Gladden, John Doe (1),Alexander St. Peter, Kevin Dreyfus, Bryon Tompkins, and Lt. Archer are dismissed as parties to this action because all claims against them have been dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/19/12. (lygsl, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/17/12. (lyg, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute ORDER denying as unnecessary 4 Motion to Amend Defendants/Add Claims, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/10/12.(lyg, )
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/11. (lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Heinis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ujcich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryon Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Heinis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Greaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander St. Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Allen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?