Hermann v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: John Hermann
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv03188
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2016 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice as premature 142 Motion to Stay Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/15/2016.(slibi, )
March 25, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk: in favor of Hartford Casualty Insurance Company against John Hermann re: 139 Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment. By Clerk on 3/25/16. (kfinn)
October 7, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 126 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge; denying 113 First Motion To Amend the Complaint. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/7/2015.(mlace, )
March 4, 2015 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Joint Motion To Reopen Civil Action by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/4/15.(dkals, )
July 9, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 , 95 Motions to Continue Trial. The Trial Preparation Conference set 7/12/2013, at 1:30 p.m., and the trial set to begin 7/29/2013, are VACATED. The Second Trial Preparation Conference Order [# 87 ] entered12/17/2012, is AMENDED and SUPPLEMENTED accordingly. Pending resolution of the plaintiff's bankruptcy proceedings, under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, this action is CLOSED ADMINISTRATIVELY. All other pending motions, including those docketed as [# 65 , # 67 , # 68 , # 90 , and # 91 ] are DENIED as moot, subject to renewal once this case is reopened for good cause. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 7/9/2013. (klyon, )
December 17, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/12. (rebsec, ) Modified on 12/17/2012 to correct spelling. (kfinn, ).
December 11, 2012 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Continue Trial Date. Approving and adopting 82 Report and Recommendations. Trial Preparation Conference Order 12 is AMENDED and SUPPLEMENTED Telephonic setting conference set 12/17/2012 09:30 AM to reschedule the trial preparation conference and trial. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/11/12. (kfinn, )
November 15, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/15/2012. 75 The Unopposed Motion by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company to Permit Certain Discovery After the Discovery Deadline is denied without prejudice. FTR: C. Coomes -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd)
November 7, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 62 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure of Ryan A. Spear, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2012. (mehcd)
March 30, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Vacate The Early Neutral Evaluation, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/30/12.(mjgsl, )
January 27, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/21/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 1/7/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/27/12. (rebsec, )
December 8, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Hartford Casualty Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of the Deadline to Answer. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company answer due 12/19/2011, signed by Boulder County, District Court Judge, Ingrid S. Bakke, on 11/28/11. (lyg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hermann v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hermann
Represented By: Peter Joseph Moyson
Represented By: John G. Taussig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael D. Alper
Represented By: Kenneth Edward Stalzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?