24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. v. Conry
Plaintiff: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Defendant: Eric Conry
Case Number: 1:2011cv03200
Filed: December 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINAL JUDGMENT re: 27 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 1/22/13. (sgrim)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order of Dismissal. Having resolved the matter of sanctions, the above captioned action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge John L. Kane on 1/9/13. (sgrim)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Order Denying 25 Reconsideration of Attorney Fee Award, by Judge John L. Kane on 11/2/12. (sgrim)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Memorandum Opinion and ORDER granting 21 Motion for an Order Awarding Entitlement to Reasonable Attorney Fees as Sanctions Against Opposing Counsel Pursuant to 28 USC § 1927 for Multiplying Proceedings Unreasonably and Vexatiously, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/24/12.(lygsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc. v. Conry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Conry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?