Nelson v. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Carolyn Nelson
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2011cv03236
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Unopposed Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 23 is GRANTED. Expert Witness Disclosures due on or before 10/5/12, rebuttal experts due on or before 11/11/12. Discovery and Dispositve Motion Deadlines extended to 11/20/12. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/23/12.(bnbcd, )
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Renewed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order.Discovery Cut-Off is 10/9/2012. Dispositive Motions Deadline is 10/9/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/10/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/11/12.(pabcd)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/7/12.(mnfsl, )
December 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/30/11. (bnbcd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael D. Alper
Represented By: Matthew Robert Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Nelson
Represented By: Todd Frank Bovo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?