Lequire v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Pete Lequire
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2011cv03243
Filed: December 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Joint Motion for Order to Approve Stipulation of Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/10/12.(lygsl, )
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/14/12.(lygsl, )
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiff's Brief due by 6/11/2012. SS Defendant's Brief due by 7/11/2012. SS Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 7/26/2012, by Judge John L. Kane on 5/2/12. (lygsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lequire v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Lequire
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?