Bomprezzi v. Kaprivnikar
Plaintiff: Mel Bomprezzi
Defendant: Joan Kaprivnikar
Case Number: 1:2011cv03344
Filed: December 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Colorado Department of Corrections, Joan Kaprivnikar against Mel Bomprezzi re: 99 Order, by Clerk on 3/4/2014. (klyon, )
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Concerning Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 81 ] filed April 24, 2013, is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The Motion for Temporary Injunction of Involuntary Antipsychotics Administ ration [# 79 ] filed April 22, 2013, is DENIED. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 93 ] filed October 29, 2013, is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgement [# 87 ] filed September 9, 2013, is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/27/2014. (klyon, )
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Amending 73 Order Adopting Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge. Paragraph 6 on pages three and four of the Order Adopting Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge [# 73 ] is AMENDED to read: "That the defendant 9;s Motion To Dismiss [# 44 ] filed May 14, 2012,is DENIED as to the plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment substantive due process claim;". That paragraph 7 on page four of the Order Adopting Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge [#[ 73]] is AMENDED to read: "That under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), the defendant's Motion To Dismiss [# 44 ] filed May 14, 2012, is GRANTED as to the plaintiff's Thirteenth Amendment claim, the plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim, and any remaining portion of the plaintiff's procedural due process claim, and those claims are DISMISSED. Otherwise, the Order Adopting Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge [# 73 ] SHALL REMAIN in full force and effect. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/22/2014. (klyon, )
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER granting 95 Defendant's Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/4/2013. (mehcd)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 62 Clarifications. The United States District Judge assigned to this case is Robert E. Blackburn. Otherwise, the motion is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/3/2013.(klyon, )
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 47 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court; The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 60 is APPROVED and A DOPTED as an order of this court; The plaintiff's objection 58 is OVERRULED; The plaintiff's filing captioned "Stop Dr. Kaprivnikar Now!" 26 read as a motion for preliminary injunction, is DENIED; The plaintiff's Summary Judgment Request in the Plaintiff's Favor 39 is DENIED; The defendant's Motion To Dismiss 44 is DENIED as to the plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment procedural due process claim and is GRANTED as to the plaintiff's Thirteenth Am endment claim, the plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim, and the plaintiff's substantive due process claim, and those claims are DISMISSED; The plaintiff's motion captioned "Addition of Two More Defendants & Appeal to Lewis Babcock on Slavery Issue and Involuntary Intoxication" 54 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/18/13. (kfinn, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 66 Motion To Withdraw Action; denying as moot 67 Motion For Leave To Reinstate Case and More. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/27/12. (kfinn, )
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay Discovery. This matter is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the motion to dismiss and further order of the Court. The Scheduling Conference currently set for June 4, 2012 is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/18/12.(mjgsl, )
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Draw in Part to District Judge and Magistrate Judge. Defendant Colorado Department of Corrections is dismissed as an improper party to this action. The Complaint as asserted against Defendant Dr.Joan Kaprivnikar shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/12/2012. (sah, )
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. ORDERED that the Letter 6 will be stricken pursuant to Rule 12(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's filing titled "Change to Title 42, Section 1983 Jurisdiction & Second Request Pleas,&quo t; 7 is construed as an Objection and is overruled. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Plaintiff 2 copies each of a Prisoner Complaint form and a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 form, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/17/12.(lyg, )
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/28/11. (lygsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bomprezzi v. Kaprivnikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Bomprezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Kaprivnikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?