Lilak v. Takeda Pharmaceutical North America, INC.
Plaintiff: Safdar Lilak
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical North America, INC.
Case Number: 1:2011cv03379
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER denying 78 Motion Demanding Compensation for Injuries and Damages Pecuniary and Non-Pecuniary, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/23/2015.(agarc, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/5/15. It is ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [Docket No. 65] is ACCEPTED. It is further ORDERED that the portion of plaintiffs October 8, 2014 filing which seeks summary judgmen t is STRICKEN for violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d). It is further ORDERED that defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 [Docket No. 59] is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendants Motion to Strike [Docket No. 56 ] and defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) [Docket No. 36] are DENIED as moot. It is further ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendant may have its costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. It is further ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety. (kpreu)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER denying 48 Motion Rule 12(e) Amended Pleadings-Complaint-Declaration. The court notes that plaintiff's pro se status does not entitle him to application of different rules. Wells v. Krebs, 2010 WL 3521777, at *2 (D. Colo. Sept. 1, 2010) by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/18/14.(jhawk, )
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER denying 43 Plaintiff's Motion Rule 12(e) Amended Pleadings- Complaint-Declaration, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/13/2014.(emill)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion Rule 12(e) Amended Pleadings- Complaint-Declaration, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/11/2014.(emill)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/8/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/4/14. (mfiel, )
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 22 Motion to Temporarily Suspend and Defer All Activities for 36 Months. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/20/2013.(klyon, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF(S) Status Conference set for 3/6/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/2012. (mjwcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilak v. Takeda Pharmaceutical North America, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safdar Lilak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical North America, INC.
Represented By: Katherine Michele Anderson
Represented By: Sandy Marie Eloranto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?