Williamson v. G4S Secure Solutions, Inc. (USA)
Plaintiff: James Williamson
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions, Inc. (USA)
Case Number: 1:2011cv03402
Filed: December 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL, INC. AND G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS, DENVER ONLY. The 32 Stipulated Motion Regarding Dismissal of Parties is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all clai ms against defendants G4S Secure Solutions International, Inc. and G4S Secure Solutions, Denver only are dismissed, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The caption shall be amended as set forth in the caption of this Order. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/7/13.(mnfsl, )
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 12/17/12. (cbssec)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting a Second Scheduling Conference on 12/11/2012 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 11/20/12. (cbssec)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 3/15/2012 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/11/12. (cbssec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. G4S Secure Solutions, Inc. (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Williamson
Represented By: Eric V. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions, Inc. (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?