Business Bank of St. Louis v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Business Bank of St. Louis
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00050
Filed: January 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party bears its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/23/13. (jjhsl, )
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 44 Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/19/2013. (mehcd)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order (Doc. 11). Deadline for interrogatories is 7/20/2012. Deadline for Requests for Production of Documents and/or Admissions is 7/20/2012. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/18/2012. (mehcd)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Amended Stipulation and ORDER Regarding Personal and Financial Information by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/08/12. (jjhsl, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Order Approving Stipulation, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/3/2012. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Business Bank of St. Louis v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Business Bank of St. Louis
Represented By: Thomas Cummings
Represented By: Christian C. Onsager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?