Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company v. Colorado Capital Bank et al

Plaintiff: Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Colorado Capital Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and First Citizens Bank and Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00161
Filed: January 20, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Administratively Close Case Pending Resolution of State Court Matter re: 50 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. All deadlines and hearings are vacated. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/27/12.(dkals, )
September 11, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2012. The court DENIES without prejudice 25 Motion to Stay. FTR: Robin Mason. (cbscd, )
February 7, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 4/19/2012 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/7/12. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company v. Colorado Capital Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Bankers Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Chesley K. Culp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Capital Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Citizens Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?