Arrington v. Born-n-Raised, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Troy R. Arrington, II
Defendant: Born-n-Raised, Inc. and Timothy R. Chavez
Case Number: 1:2012cv00172
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 252 Motion to Review Taxation of Costs by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/28/15. Defendant shall be awarded additional costs in the amount of $3,303.22 for a total cost award in the amount of $6,093.66 to be taxed against Plaintiff.(dkals, )
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER re: 251 Proposed Bill of Costs filed by Troy R. Arrington, II. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Appeal of Assessment of Costs 251 is DENIED. by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/27/2015. (tscha, )
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Timothy R. Chavez against Troy R. Arrington, II pursuant to 229 Jury Trial - Concluded, by Clerk on 12/19/2014. (eseam)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/17/2014. (eseam)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER pursuant to the hearing held on 12/5/2014, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/5/2014. (eseam)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER pursuant to the hearing held on October 21, 2014, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/21/2014. (eseam)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MINUTE ENTRY for Final Pretrial Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/26/2014. Motion for Phone Conference Regarding Settlement Conference and Records Custodian Deposition Dates # 175 is WITHDRAWN. ORDERED: Motion for Conference on Discovery Dispute # 182 is WITHDRAWN. FTR: KLM Courtroom C204. (lgale)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying 179 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Testimony of Julie Barnes Romero, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/20/2014. (eseam)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/14/2014. 175 Plaintiff's Motion for Phone Conference Regarding Settlement Conference and Records Custodian Deposition Dates is GRANTED in part and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT in part. Settlement Conference set for 6/19/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (cpear)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 155 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Untimely Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c). By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/9/2014.(klyon, )
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MINUTE ORDER denying 168 Motion for Leave to File Response to Reply to Response to Motion to Strike. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/18/2014.(klyon, )
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/14 DENYING 161 Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Objections to Requests for Admissions and to Establish That Documents Provided By a Party in Discovery Are Admissions and Are Self-Authenticating.(lgale)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty to schedule a settlement conference where all parties are to be present in person, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/12/2014. (eseam)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER pursuant to the motion hearing held on 3/10/2014, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/10/2014. (eseam)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Testimony of Miranda and Watson, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/2/2013. (eseam)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Strike or Limit the Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts, Jeff Watson and Michael Miranda, and to Preclude Undisclosed Rebuttal Opinions Pursuant to Daubert and Fed. R. Evid. 702 by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/19/13.(dkals, )
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Granting 99 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Denying without prejudice 100 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Granting 101 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Denying without prejudice 102 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Denying 103 Defendant's Motion in Limine. Granting 104 Defendant's Motion in Limine, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/1/2013. (eseam)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Report of Accident Reconstructionist and to File Response to Reply to Response to Motion in Limine Regarding Claim Notes, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/29/2013. (eseam)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MINUTE ORDER granting 109 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement His Motion In Limine, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/30/2013. (eseam)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Dispositive Motion, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/13/2013. (eseam)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER denying 91 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Response to Motion for Leave to File Dispositive Motion, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/5/2013. (eseam)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re: 81 Courtroom Minutes by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/17/13. (dkals, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. BNR's Motion for Approval of Defendants' Bill of Costs 41 is GRANTED to the extent that BNR is entitled to costs as the prevailing party. The amount of costs awarded to BNR shall be determined by the court clerk, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/15/2013.(wjmcd, )
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion 70 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted to the extent that the Scheduling Order is further modified. Discovery due by 5/15/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2013. The Motion is denied as to setting a settlement conference on 5/16/13, as the Court is unavailable on that date, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/20/13.(sgrim)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/29/2012. (eseam)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Stipulated Motion for Amendment to Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order entered on June 29, 2012 13 is modified to extend the following deadlines: Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures Deadline February 4, 2013; Defendant's Expert Disclosures Deadline February 18, 2013; Discovery Deadline February 28, 2013; Dispositive Motions Deadline March 29, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/26/12.(mjgsl, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 18 Defendant Born N' Raised Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall enter for Defendant Born N' Raised Inc. and against Plaintiff. This matter shall proceed between Plaintiff and Defendant Chavez only, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/22/2012. (eseam)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to Add Claim for Exemplary Damages, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/16/2012. (eseam)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Date to File Response to Motion to Dismiss and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and to File an Amended Complaint to Add Claim for Exemplary Damages 24 is DENIED as moot; Plaintiff sh all file a response to Defendant BNRs Motion for Summary Judgment 18 on or before 10/18/12; and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 17 is GRANTED as confessed, and Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/28/12.(lygsl, )
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/20/12.(lygsl, )
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting 8 The Unopposed Motion for Order that Plaintiffs Counsel be Permitted to Appear at June 29, 2012 Scheduling Conference by Phone; granting 9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Attorney Hugh D. Wise, III terminated, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/24/2012.(ervsl, )
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND STANDING ORDER FOR ANY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/26/2012. (eseam)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrington v. Born-n-Raised, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy R. Arrington, II
Represented By: J. Michael Considine, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Born-n-Raised, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy R. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?