Ramirez-Tolentino v. Woodbury et al
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Ramirez-Tolentino
Defendant: Aaron H. Woodbury, Aaron (I) H. Woodbury and City of Aurora
Case Number: 1:2012cv00180
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE granting 35 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims. All claims asserted in this matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this action. By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/19/2012. (klyon, )
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS. The 30 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant Aaron H. Woodbury and Motion to Recaption is GRANTED. Any and all claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant Aaron H. Woodbury are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own attorneys fees and costs. All future captions shall omit Defendant Woodbury, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/07/2012.(wjcsl, )
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/11/12. (msksec, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositio ns from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/7/12. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez-Tolentino v. Woodbury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Manuel Ramirez-Tolentino
Represented By: Douglas Leo Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron H. Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron (I) H. Woodbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?