Finley v. Honeywell Technology Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Finley
Defendant: Honeywell Technology Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00210
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to bear its or her own costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/13/13. (jjhsl, )
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER For Status Report re 38 : Status Report due by 3/7/2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/25/2013. (rpmcd)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting re: 38 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate the hearing scheduled for December 27, 2012 at 11:00 a.m and motions 30 and 34 are moot, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/27/2012. (rpmcd)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Amend 10 Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 1/18/2013 and Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2013 (see Order for specifics ) by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/7/2012.(rpmcd)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 16 : plaintiff's motion is granted and Greg Fisher and Bernie DeMoss are precluded from attendance at the plaintiff's deposition, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/29/2012. (rpmcd)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Extending Deadlines, granting 14 Motion to Amend 10 : Discovery due by 12/19/2012 (see Order for other deadlines), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/10/2012.(rpmcd )
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 12 , signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/15/2012. (rpmcd)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/18/2012 at 03:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 12, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/9/2012. (rpmcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finley v. Honeywell Technology Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Finley
Represented By: Timothy Michael Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Technology Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jimmy Goh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?