Robinson et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Milton Robinson and Brazetta Robinson
Defendant: United States of America, Nancy Claire Robert, Marsha A. Costelow and Diane Adams
Case Number: 1:2012cv00261
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/12.(dkals, )
February 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/13/13. (dkals, )
February 14, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/30/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/14/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Robinson
Represented By: Eric Louis Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brazetta Robinson
Represented By: Eric Louis Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Claire Robert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha A. Costelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.