Gundlach v. People of the State of Colorado
Plaintiff: Gabriele Gundlach
Defendant: People of the State of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2012cv00345
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/15/2013. (cmacd) Modified on 3/15/2013 Document filed in the incorrect case.
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Prisoner Complaint and the action are dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the pending motions 8 11 16 and petitions are denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/4/12.(lygsl, )
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER denying 17 Motion to Change Venue by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/2012.(skssl, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/26/12. (lygsl, )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/13/12. (lsw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gundlach v. People of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriele Gundlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?