Frazier v. Clements et al

Petitioner: Keith Frazier
Respondent: Tom Clements, Michael Miller and John Suthers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00354
Filed: February 9, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING 1 APPLICATION : the application is denied and this civil action is dismissed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/21/2013. (rpmcd )
February 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re 11 : the application is denied and this civil action is dismissed, by Deputy Clerk on 2/21/2013. (rpmcd)
April 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEAL re 21 USCA Order, 13 and 16 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/17/2013. (rpmcd) (Main Document 22 replaced on 4/17/2013) (rpmcd, ).
June 11, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REPLY re: 6 and 1 : the applicant will file a reply at least addressing the question of how to proceed with this mixed petition on or before July 2, 2012, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/11/2012. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith Frazier
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Clements
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Miller
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Suthers
Represented By: John Jacob Fuerst, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.