United Financial Casualty Company v. Lapp et al
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Defendant: W-L Enterprises, LLC, Richard Lapp, Wright-Lorenz Grain Co. Inc., Gary Jordan, Western Heritage Insurance Company, Christopher Nelson, Bradley Swartzwelter, National Railroad Passenger Corporation and BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00432
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk. ORDERED that the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Hegarty 62 is ADOPTED. United's Amended Complaint 34 is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and the case is closed. Plaintiff is AWARDED its costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court. By Clerk on 3/22/13. (kfinn, )
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS, ADOPTING RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court OVERRULES United's Objections (# 70 ), ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (# 62 ), and GRANTS Mr. Lapp's Motion to D ismiss (# 40 ). United's Amended Complaint (# 34 ) is DISMISSED for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332 and the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Because the Court dismisses this action, Mr. Lapp's Motion to Stay Proceedings and for Administrative Closure (# 59 ) and Motion to Supplement Response (# 82 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/21/2013. (klyon, )
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 76 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cutoff. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/6/2013.(klyon, )
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Protective Order re: [Plaintiff's] First Set of Written Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) filed by Defendant Richard Lapp d/b/a Slick Spot Farm & Truck ("Slick Spot"). Slick Spot shall serve responses to the remaining discovery requests on or before 2/21/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/1/2013. (mehcd)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/29/12. (msksec, )
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 46 Defendant Richard Lapp d/b/a Slick Spot Farm & Truck's Motion to Stay Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/26/2012.(wjcsl, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's Amended, Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint for Declaratory Relief. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the [29-1] Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/5/2012. (mehcd)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint for Declaratory Relief, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/22/2012. (mehcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Financial Casualty Company v. Lapp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W-L Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright-Lorenz Grain Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Swartzwelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Nichole Suzanne Bogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Brian Douglas Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?