Parker v. Milyard et al
Plaintiff: Keith Parker
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, Kevin Milyard and Ryan Long
Case Number: 1:2012cv00448
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Watanabe 65 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1988(b) 55 is GRANTED, and defendants Milyard and Long are awarded attorney fees in the amount of $5551.00 by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/16/13.(jjhsl, )
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Final JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the claims against defendant John Doe are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Accordingly, final judgment is hereby entered and plaintiffs complaint and action are dismissed by Clerk on 12/21/12. (jjhsl, )
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Boland 49 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion [for] Emergency Temporary Restraining Order 26 is DENIED. ORDERED that the claims against defendant John Doe areDISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) (ii). Accordingly, this matter is DISMISSED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/20/12.(jjhsl, )
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the plaintiff's Extension of Time to File Reply Motion 40 is granted. ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion for Status Update 41 is granted in part and denied in part, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/26/12.(sgrim)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Status Conference set for 9/18/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/3/2012. (mjwcd)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/14/12. (nmmsl, )
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER denying as premature 16 Motion for Copies to be Served ; and denying as unnecessary 17 Motion For Continuance, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/12.(nmmsl, )
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/01/12. (nmmsl, )
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Minute ORDER denying 4 Motion for Copies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/24/12.(lyg, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Milyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Milyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?