Tierra Group, LLC, The v. Madhava Honey Ltd.
Plaintiff: Tierra Group, LLC, The
Defendant: Madhava Honey Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00476
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Stipulated Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/2/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/18/13.(mnfsl, )
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/9/2012. (klmcd, )
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. The Clerk of the Court shall accept Defendant's Amended Answer [29-1] for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/22/12.(mjgsl, )
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Madhava Honey Ltd. Attorney Schwartz and Attorney Birlem are relieved of any further representation of Defendant in this case, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/26/2012.(wjcsl, )
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/12. (msksec, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tierra Group, LLC, The v. Madhava Honey Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tierra Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Patrick Compton
Represented By: David Alan Allgeyer
Represented By: Jeri J. Wettestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madhava Honey Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher James Sundermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?