Galena Street Fund, L.P. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Galena Street Fund, L.P.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00587
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/7/14 re: Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 153 . The Motion is GRANTED as follows: Fact discovery due by 1/16/2015. Expert designation due by 1/16/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2015, is vacated and reset to 5/5/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/28/2015. (bsimm, )
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/14 re: Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 151 . The Motion is GRANTED as follows: Fact discovery Cut-off is now 11/7/2014. Parties shall designate all experts on or before 11/7/2014. Dispositive Motion Deadline is now 12/19/2014. The Pretrial Conference set for November 13, 2014, is vacated and reset to 2/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2015. (bsimm, )
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/8/14 re: Defendant's Motion to Withdraw its Motion for Protective Order with Respect to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Discovery 147 . IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the Defendant's Motion for Protective Order with Respect to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Discovery 145 is DENIED AS WITHDRAWN. The hearing set for May 15, 2014, is VACATED. (bsimm)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/14. Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Its Second Motion to Compel 143 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel 101 is DENIED as withdrawn; and Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Restrict Access 100 is GRANTED. (bsimm)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER re: 131 Order. Doc. ##71-1 and 71-2 shall be Restricted Level 1 in their entirety, my previous Order (Doc. 131) notwithstanding. On or before 3/18/2014, Galena shall file unrestricted and open to public inspection duplicates of the materials contained at Doc. #71-1 at pages 59-60 and Doc. #71-2 at pages 42-49, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/11/2014. (eseam)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/10/14 re: Plaintiff Galena's Motion to Compel and Request for Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(b)(5)(B) 73 . The Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED with respect to Exhibits B25 and B35; and DENIED in all other respects. (Simmons, B.)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER granting 92 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/14/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/1/2013.(klyon, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. Galena's 74 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Its Motion to Compel is granted. Doc. # 70 shall be RESTRICTED--Level 1. Doc. ## 70-1 through 70-4 shall not be restricted and shall remain open to public inspection. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/25/13.(mnfsl, )
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/16/13.(bnbcd, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss. GRANTED insofar as it seeks dismissal of the negligence claim against Wells Fargo in its capacity as trustee and DENIED in all other respects. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/15/13.(bnbcd, )
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset to 2/12/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/28/13.(bnbcd, )
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting 58 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/30/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/1/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2013. Jury trial VACATED, to be reset at the Final Pretrial Conference. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/24/13.(bnbcd, )
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: 53 MOTION for Protective Order is DENIED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/29/12. (bnbcd, )
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER: 47 Motion for Leave to File Amended Designation of Nonparty at Fault is GRANTED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/31/12.(bnbcd, )
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/21/12. (bnbcd, )
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b), the randomly designated magistrate judge shall conduct proceedings in this civil action. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/6/12. (mnfsl, )
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. Status Report due by 6/20/2012, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/04/2012. (wjcsl, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/26/12. (bnbcd, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/8/2012. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galena Street Fund, L.P. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galena Street Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Rollin
Represented By: Daniel M. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kara Diane Lyons
Represented By: David W. Stark
Represented By: Marie Elizabeth Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?